There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to clarify the application of such Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/05/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/21/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Labor Standards.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
03/05/1991Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (159)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 04/11/1991
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/11/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/11/1991
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/11/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/11/1991
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 04/11/1991
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 04/11/1991
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 04/11/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 04/11/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 04/11/1991
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/11/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 04/11/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 04/11/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 04/11/1991
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 04/11/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 04/11/1991
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 04/11/1991
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/11/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 04/11/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/11/1991
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 04/11/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 04/11/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/11/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 04/11/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 04/11/1991
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 04/11/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 04/11/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 04/11/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/11/1991
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/11/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/11/1991
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 04/11/1991
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 04/11/1991
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 04/11/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 04/11/1991
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/11/1991
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 04/11/1991
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/11/1991
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/11/1991
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 04/11/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 04/11/1991
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 04/11/1991
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 04/11/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 05/08/1991
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 05/08/1991
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/08/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/08/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 05/08/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/08/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/08/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 05/08/1991
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/08/1991
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/08/1991
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/08/1991
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 05/08/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/08/1991
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/08/1991
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 05/08/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 05/08/1991
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 05/08/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/08/1991
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 05/08/1991
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/08/1991
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 05/08/1991
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/08/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/08/1991
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 05/08/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 05/08/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 05/08/1991
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 05/08/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 05/08/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 05/08/1991
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/08/1991
Rep. Nichols, Dick [R-KS-5] 05/08/1991
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 05/08/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 05/08/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/08/1991
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/08/1991
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/08/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/08/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 05/08/1991
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/08/1991
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 05/08/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 05/08/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 05/08/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 05/22/1991
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 05/22/1991
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 05/22/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 05/22/1991
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 05/22/1991
Rep. Luken, Charles [D-OH-1] 05/22/1991
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 05/22/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 05/22/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 05/22/1991
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 05/22/1991
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/22/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 05/22/1991
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 05/22/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 06/26/1991
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/26/1991
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/26/1991
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 06/26/1991
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/26/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/26/1991
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 06/26/1991
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 06/26/1991
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 07/24/1991
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 07/24/1991
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/24/1991
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 07/24/1991
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 07/24/1991
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 07/24/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/24/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/24/1991
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/24/1991
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/24/1991
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 07/24/1991
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 07/24/1991
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/24/1991
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 09/24/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 09/24/1991
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 09/24/1991
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 09/24/1991
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 10/02/1991
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 10/02/1991
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 10/02/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 11/07/1991

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor03/05/1991 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Labor Standards03/21/1991 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1237. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/05/1991)

Amends the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to revise its application.

Revises minimum wage and maximum hours provisions (as well as provisions for special industry committees for American Samoa) to apply such requirements specifically to employers of employees who in any workweek are engaged in industrial homework and who are either engaged in commerce or in the production of goods in commerce (in addition to any other employees so employed).

Revises the scope of the application of requirements relating to: (1) wage rate orders for employers in American Samoa; (2) prohibition of sex discrimination in wage rates; and (3) handicapped workers.