Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 04/11/1991
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/11/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/11/1991
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/11/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/11/1991
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 04/11/1991
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 04/11/1991
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 04/11/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 04/11/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 04/11/1991
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/11/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 04/11/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 04/11/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 04/11/1991
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 04/11/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 04/11/1991
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 04/11/1991
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/11/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 04/11/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/11/1991
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 04/11/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 04/11/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/11/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 04/11/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 04/11/1991
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 04/11/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 04/11/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 04/11/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/11/1991
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/11/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/11/1991
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 04/11/1991
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 04/11/1991
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 04/11/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 04/11/1991
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/11/1991
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 04/11/1991
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/11/1991
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/11/1991
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 04/11/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 04/11/1991
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 04/11/1991
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 04/11/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 05/08/1991
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 05/08/1991
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/08/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/08/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 05/08/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/08/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/08/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 05/08/1991
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/08/1991
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/08/1991
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/08/1991
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 05/08/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/08/1991
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/08/1991
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 05/08/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 05/08/1991
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 05/08/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/08/1991
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 05/08/1991
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/08/1991
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 05/08/1991
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/08/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/08/1991
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 05/08/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 05/08/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 05/08/1991
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 05/08/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 05/08/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 05/08/1991
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/08/1991
Rep. Nichols, Dick [R-KS-5] 05/08/1991
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 05/08/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 05/08/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/08/1991
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/08/1991
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/08/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/08/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 05/08/1991
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/08/1991
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 05/08/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 05/08/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 05/08/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 05/22/1991
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 05/22/1991
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 05/22/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 05/22/1991
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 05/22/1991
Rep. Luken, Charles [D-OH-1] 05/22/1991
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 05/22/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 05/22/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 05/22/1991
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 05/22/1991
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/22/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 05/22/1991
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 05/22/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 06/26/1991
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/26/1991
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/26/1991
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 06/26/1991
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/26/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/26/1991
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 06/26/1991
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 06/26/1991
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 07/24/1991
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 07/24/1991
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/24/1991
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 07/24/1991
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 07/24/1991
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 07/24/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/24/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/24/1991
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/24/1991
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/24/1991
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 07/24/1991
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 07/24/1991
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/24/1991
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 09/24/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 09/24/1991
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 09/24/1991
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 09/24/1991
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 10/02/1991
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 10/02/1991
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 10/02/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 11/07/1991