Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 03/05/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 03/21/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/21/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/21/1991
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/21/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/21/1991
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 03/21/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 03/21/1991
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/21/1991
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/21/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 03/21/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/21/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/21/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/21/1991
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 03/21/1991
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 04/11/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 04/11/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 04/11/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 04/11/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 04/11/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 04/11/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 04/11/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/11/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 04/11/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 04/11/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 04/24/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 04/24/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 04/24/1991
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 04/24/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 04/24/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 04/24/1991
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 04/24/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 04/24/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 04/24/1991
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/24/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 04/24/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 05/21/1991
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 05/21/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 05/21/1991
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/21/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 07/17/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 09/12/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/25/1991
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/25/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 09/25/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 09/25/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 10/08/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 10/08/1991
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16] 10/08/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 10/08/1991
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 10/15/1991
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 10/15/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/13/1991
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 11/26/1991