Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-13]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-29]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/16/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 04/16/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/16/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 04/16/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 04/16/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 04/16/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/16/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/16/1991
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/16/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 04/16/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 04/16/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 04/16/1991
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 04/16/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 04/16/1991
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 04/16/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 04/16/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 04/16/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 04/16/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 04/16/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 06/05/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/05/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/05/1991
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/24/1992
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 10/03/1992