Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 03/05/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 03/12/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/12/1991
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 03/12/1991
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/12/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/12/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 03/12/1991
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 03/12/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 03/12/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/12/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 03/12/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 03/12/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 03/12/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 03/22/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/22/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/22/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/22/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 03/22/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 03/22/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 03/22/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/22/1991
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/15/1991
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/15/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/22/1991
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 05/22/1991
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 05/22/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 05/22/1991
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 05/22/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/22/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/22/1991
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 05/22/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/19/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 10/16/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 10/16/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 10/17/1991
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 10/24/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 10/24/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/07/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/07/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 11/07/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/07/1991
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 11/07/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 11/20/1991
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 01/28/1992
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 01/28/1992
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/10/1992
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 03/10/1992
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 03/10/1992
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/20/1992
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/07/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 04/07/1992
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 07/28/1992