Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 03/06/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 03/06/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 03/11/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 03/11/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/11/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/11/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/18/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/20/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 03/22/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 03/22/1991
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 04/09/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/18/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 04/18/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/22/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/07/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/09/1991
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/09/1991
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 05/15/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 05/29/1991
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/06/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 06/12/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/19/1991
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/20/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 06/26/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/27/1991
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 07/16/1991
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 07/17/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 07/17/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 07/22/1991
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/11/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 09/17/1991
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/26/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 09/26/1991
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 10/07/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/09/1991
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/10/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 10/23/1991
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/31/1991
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 11/01/1991
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/01/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 11/22/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 01/28/1992
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-13] 02/18/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 03/30/1992
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 04/03/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 04/28/1992
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/28/1992
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 04/30/1992
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/19/1992
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 05/21/1992
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/04/1992
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 08/10/1992
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 10/04/1992

Show cosponsors who withdrew