Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4]* 03/07/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 03/07/1991
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13]* 03/07/1991
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6]* 03/07/1991
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/17/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 04/17/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/17/1991
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/17/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/17/1991
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 04/17/1991
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/17/1991
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 04/17/1991
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/17/1991
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 04/17/1991
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/17/1991
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/17/1991
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44] 04/17/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 04/17/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/17/1991
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 04/17/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 04/17/1991
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 04/17/1991
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/17/1991
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 04/17/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 04/17/1991
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 04/17/1991
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 04/17/1991
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/17/1991
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 04/17/1991
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 04/17/1991
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 04/17/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 04/17/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/17/1991
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 04/17/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 04/17/1991
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 04/17/1991
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/17/1991
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/08/1991
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 05/08/1991
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/08/1991
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 05/08/1991
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/08/1991
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/08/1991
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 05/08/1991
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/08/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/08/1991
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/08/1991
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/08/1991
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 05/08/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/08/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 05/08/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 05/08/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 05/08/1991
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 05/08/1991
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 05/08/1991
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 05/08/1991
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 05/08/1991
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/08/1991
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/08/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 05/08/1991
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/29/1991
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 05/29/1991
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 05/29/1991
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 05/29/1991
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 05/29/1991
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 05/29/1991
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/29/1991
Rep. Nichols, Dick [R-KS-5] 05/29/1991
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/29/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 05/29/1991
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/29/1991
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 05/29/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 06/18/1991
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 06/18/1991
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 06/18/1991
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 06/18/1991
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 06/18/1991
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 06/18/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 06/18/1991
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 06/18/1991
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 06/18/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 06/18/1991
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 06/18/1991
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 06/26/1991
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/26/1991
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/26/1991
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/26/1991
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/26/1991
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 06/26/1991
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 06/26/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/26/1991
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 06/26/1991
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 07/23/1991
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 07/23/1991
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 07/23/1991
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/23/1991
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 07/23/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 07/23/1991
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 07/23/1991
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 07/23/1991
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/23/1991
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/23/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 07/23/1991
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/23/1991
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 08/02/1991
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 08/02/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 08/02/1991
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 08/02/1991
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 08/02/1991
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 08/02/1991
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/02/1991
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 09/26/1991
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 09/26/1991
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 10/23/1991
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/23/1991
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 11/18/1991
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 11/18/1991
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/05/1992
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 02/25/1992
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6] 03/04/1992
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 03/04/1992
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 04/09/1992
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/09/1992
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 04/29/1992

Show cosponsors who withdrew