Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/07/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/07/1991
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/12/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/12/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/12/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 03/12/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 03/12/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/12/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/12/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/12/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/12/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 03/13/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/13/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 03/20/1991
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 03/20/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 03/20/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 03/20/1991
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 03/20/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 03/20/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/20/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 03/20/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 03/20/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/20/1991
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 04/11/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/11/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/11/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 04/11/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 04/11/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 04/11/1991
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 04/11/1991
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 04/11/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 04/11/1991
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 04/11/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 04/11/1991
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 04/18/1991
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 04/18/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 04/18/1991
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 04/18/1991
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/18/1991
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/18/1991
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 04/18/1991
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 04/18/1991
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-29] 04/18/1991
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 04/18/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 04/18/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 04/22/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/22/1991
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 04/22/1991
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 05/08/1991
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/08/1991
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 05/08/1991
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 05/08/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/08/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/08/1991
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 05/08/1991
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/08/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/08/1991
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/08/1991
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/08/1991
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/08/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 05/16/1991
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 05/16/1991
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16] 05/21/1991
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 05/21/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/21/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 05/21/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 05/21/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/21/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/23/1991
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/23/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 05/29/1991
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 05/29/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/29/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/04/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/04/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 06/04/1991
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/04/1991
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 06/06/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/06/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 06/11/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 06/11/1991
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 06/12/1991
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/18/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 06/18/1991
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 06/19/1991
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 06/19/1991
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 07/10/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/10/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/23/1991
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 09/12/1991
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 09/12/1991
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 09/12/1991
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/12/1991
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/16/1991
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 09/16/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 09/16/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 09/16/1991
Rep. Luken, Charles [D-OH-1] 09/24/1991
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 09/24/1991
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 09/24/1991
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/24/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/24/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/24/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 09/24/1991
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 09/25/1991
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-13] 10/02/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 10/03/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 10/09/1991
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 10/15/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 10/22/1991
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/14/1991
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 01/29/1992