Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 03/07/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 03/07/1991
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 03/07/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 03/07/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 06/20/1991
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/20/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/20/1991
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 06/20/1991
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 06/20/1991
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 06/20/1991
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/20/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/20/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/20/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/20/1991
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 06/20/1991
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 06/20/1991
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 06/20/1991
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 06/20/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 06/20/1991
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/20/1991
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 06/20/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 06/20/1991
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 06/20/1991
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 06/20/1991
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/20/1991
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/20/1991
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/20/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/20/1991
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 06/20/1991
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/26/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 07/26/1991
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 07/26/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 07/26/1991
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/26/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/01/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 08/01/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 09/30/1991
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 09/30/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 09/30/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/28/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/25/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 11/25/1991
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 11/25/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 11/25/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/25/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 11/25/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 11/25/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/26/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 01/30/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 01/30/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 01/30/1992
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 01/30/1992
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 02/27/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 02/27/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 02/27/1992
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/27/1992

Show cosponsors who withdrew