There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Mickey Leland Adolescent Pregnancy Prevention and Parenthood Act of 1991

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize adolescent family life demonstration projects, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/12/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/28/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/12/1991Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/12/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 03/12/1991
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/12/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/12/1991
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 03/12/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/12/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 03/12/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 03/12/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/12/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 03/12/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 03/12/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2]* 03/12/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 03/12/1991
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 03/12/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14]* 03/12/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 03/12/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 03/12/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/12/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/12/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/12/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/12/1991
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 03/13/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 03/13/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 05/02/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/02/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/02/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/02/1991
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 05/02/1991
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 05/02/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 05/02/1991
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/02/1991
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/02/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/31/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 09/25/1991
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 10/03/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/28/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/12/1991 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment03/28/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1398.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1398. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/12/1991)

Mickey Leland Adolescent Pregnancy Prevention and Parenthood Act of 1991 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to replace the title on adolescent family life demonstration projects with a title on adolescent pregnancy prevention, care, and research grants.

Authorizes the Secretary of Health and Human Services to make grants to provide, supplement, or improve the quality of care services to pregnant adolescents and their male partners and adolescent parents and prevention services to nonpregnant adolescents.

Requires grantees to charge fees for services only under a fee schedule, approved by the Secretary, based on the income of the person and taking into account the difficulty adolescents face in obtaining resources to pay for services. Prohibits discrimination because of an individual's inability to pay for services.

Sets forth priorities in making grants, including giving priority to applicants that: (1) serve an area with a high incidence of adolescent pregnancy; and (2) serve an area with a high proportion of low-income families and low availability of care programs.

Requires that the amount of a grant be set by the Secretary. Limits a grant, subject to waiver for one year, to 75 percent of the cost of a program.

Specifies the information and assurances which must accompany a grant application.

Directs the Secretary to coordinate Federal policies and programs providing services relating to the prevention of initial and recurrent adolescent pregnancies and providing care services, including by requiring grantees under these provisions to report concerning Federal, State, and local policies that interfere with delivery and coordination of programs of care for pregnant adolescents and adolescent parents.

Authorizes the Secretary to make grants to institutions of higher education to support and disseminate the results of research relating to adolescent pregnancy. Limits grants or contracts to: (1) one year, subject to renewal for four additional one-year periods; and (2) subject to waiver, a specified dollar amount. Allows funds to be used for descriptive or explanatory surveys, evaluation studies, longitudinal studies, or limited programs for services that are for the purpose of increasing knowledge and understanding of specified matters.

Directs the Secretary to establish a system for the review of grant and contract applications which is similar to the system of scientific peer review of the National Institutes of Health. Allows grants only to programs determined by the review panel to have scientific merit.

Authorizes appropriations, earmarking at least two-thirds of appropriated funds for services, with no more than one-third of those amounts used for grants for prevention services.

Prohibits using grant funds for the performance of an abortion.