Committees: H.R.1415 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/13/1991 Referred to
04/30/1991 Markup by
05/08/1991 Reported by H.Rept 102-53
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on International Operations03/25/1991 Referred to
03/25/1991 Hearings by
04/18/1991 Markup by
04/18/1991 Reported by
Senate Foreign Relations05/20/1991 Referred to
07/29/1991 Discharged from