There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Popular Titles

Homosexual Discrimination bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Civil Rights Amendments Act of 1991

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Civil Rights Act of 1964 and the Fair Housing Act to prohibit discrimination on the basis of affectional or sexual orientation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/13/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
04/16/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/13/1991Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/1991Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (110)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 03/13/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/13/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 03/13/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-29]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 03/13/1991
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-13]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 03/13/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 03/21/1991
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/21/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/21/1991
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/10/1991
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 04/10/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/10/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/25/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 04/25/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 05/14/1991
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/22/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 06/12/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/12/1991
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/25/1991
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/25/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 07/31/1991
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16] 09/24/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 10/02/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 10/08/1991
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 10/30/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 11/13/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 11/13/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 11/21/1991
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 11/21/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 01/29/1992
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 02/26/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 03/05/1992
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 04/09/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/07/1992
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 07/29/1992
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 09/10/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/10/1992

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor03/13/1991 Referred to
House Judiciary03/13/1991 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights04/16/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1430.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1430. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/13/1991)

Civil Rights Amendments Act of 1991 - Amends the Civil Rights Act of 1964 and the Civil Rights Act of 1968 to prohibit discrimination on the basis of affectional or sexual orientation. Provides that this Act shall not be construed to permit a finding of discrimination based on statistical differences or the fashioning of any remedy requiring a quota.