There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize appropriations for fiscal year 1992 for the Maritime Administration, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
10/21/1991Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. H. Rept. 102-260.
03/19/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date
12/19/1991See H.R.1776.
11/25/1991Similar Provisions Incorporated in H.R.1776.
11/07/1991Unfavorable Executive Comment Received from State.
10/21/1991Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 154.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/21/1991Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. H. Rept. 102-260.
06/27/1991Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
06/27/1991Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/13/1991Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Merchant Marine
06/13/1991Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Merchant Marine
03/21/1991Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Merchant Marine
03/20/1991Referred to the Subcommittee On Merchant Marine.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
03/20/1991Executive Comment Requested from DOT.
03/19/1991Referred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/19/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries03/19/1991 Referred to
06/27/1991 Markup by
10/21/1991 Reported by H.Rept 102-260
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Merchant Marine03/20/1991 Referred to
03/21/1991 Hearings by
06/13/1991 Markup by
06/13/1991 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1464. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (10/21/1991)

Authorizes appropriations for the Maritime Administration for: (1) operating-differential subsidies; (2) manpower, education, and training; (3) operating programs; and (4) national security support capabilities, including the Ready Reserve Force.

Amends the Merchant Ship Sales Act of 1946 to require the Secretary of Transportation to acquire vessels for the Ready Reserve Force (RRF) component of the National Defense Reserve Fleet in the following order: (1) U.S.-flag/U.S.-built vessels; (2) U.S.-flag/U.S.-rebuilt vessels; and (3) U.S.-flag vessels documented for at least one year.

Requires the Secretary to ensure the readiness of vessels in the RRF by: (1) maintaining all vessels in a manner that will enable each vessel to be activated within a period specified in plans for mobilization; (2) activating and conducting sea trials on each vessel at least once every 24 months; (3) maintaining, in an enhanced activation status, those vessels that are scheduled to be activated within five days; (4) locating those vessels that are scheduled to be activated within five days near embarkation ports specified for those vessels; and (5) having each vessel inspected by the Secretary of the department in which the Coast Guard is operating to determine if the vessel meets certain safety standards.

Sets forth eligibility requirements and contract requirements for vessel managers.

Requires all repairs (except emergency repairs) and alterations to a vessel in the National Defense Reserve Fleet to be made in a privately owned shipyard in the United States.

Grants reemployment rights to merchant seamen who are employed in the activation and operation of a vessel used by the United States for a war, including participants in the Desert Shield/Desert Storm sealift operation.

Provides that the Secretary may enter into a contract for the maintenance of the National Defense Reserve Fleet only for non-routine maintenance work.

Eliminates the cap on grants to Maritime Enhancement Institutes.

Requires that a vessel engaged in dredging in the navigable waters of the United States or the Exclusive Economic Zone be a documented U.S.-flag vessel with a coastwise endorsement, and if a chartered vessel, be chartered by a person who is a U.S. citizen for purposes of engaging in the coastwise trade. Makes vessels operating in knowing violation of such requirement subject to seizure by, and forfeiture to, the U.S. Government. Specifies exceptions to such requirement. Makes Federal, State, and local merchandise subject to coastwise trade laws.

Excludes a certain vessel transporting valueless material or valueless dredged material from a specified law governing the transportation of sewage sludge.

Provides for the replacement of outported vessels.