Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 03/19/1991
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/23/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/23/1991
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/23/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 04/23/1991
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 04/23/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/23/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/23/1991
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 04/23/1991
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 04/23/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/23/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/23/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 04/23/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/23/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/23/1991
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/23/1991
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/23/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 04/23/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 05/08/1991
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/08/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 05/08/1991
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/08/1991
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 05/08/1991
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/08/1991
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 05/09/1991
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 05/09/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 05/09/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/09/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 05/09/1991
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/09/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 05/09/1991
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/09/1991
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/09/1991
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/09/1991
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/09/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/20/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/20/1991
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 05/20/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 05/20/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/20/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 05/20/1991
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 05/20/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 05/20/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 05/20/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 05/23/1991
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 05/23/1991
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 05/23/1991
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 06/03/1991
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 06/03/1991
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/03/1991
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 06/03/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/03/1991
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 06/03/1991
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/03/1991
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 06/03/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 06/03/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/03/1991
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 06/03/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 06/03/1991
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 06/03/1991
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/03/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 06/03/1991
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 06/03/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/03/1991
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 06/03/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 06/03/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/06/1991
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 06/06/1991
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 06/06/1991
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 06/06/1991
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/06/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/06/1991
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/06/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 06/19/1991
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 06/19/1991
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 06/19/1991
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 06/19/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 06/26/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 06/26/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/26/1991
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 07/16/1991
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/16/1991
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 07/16/1991
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/16/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/16/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 07/16/1991
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 07/16/1991
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 07/16/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 07/16/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/16/1991
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 07/25/1991
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 07/25/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/25/1991
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/25/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 07/25/1991
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 08/02/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 08/02/1991
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/12/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 09/12/1991
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 09/12/1991
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 09/12/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 09/12/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 09/12/1991
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 09/12/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 10/01/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 10/01/1991
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 10/01/1991
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 10/01/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 10/01/1991
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/03/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/10/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 10/17/1991
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/17/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 10/31/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 10/31/1991
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/14/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/31/1992
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 05/26/1992
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 07/08/1992
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 07/08/1992
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 07/09/1992
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 07/22/1992
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 07/22/1992
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 08/11/1992