There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To revise, codify, and enact without substantive change certain general and permanent laws, related to transportation, as subtitles II, III, and V-X of title 49, United States Code, "Transportation", and to make other technical improvements in the Code.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
10/08/1992Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
09/18/1992Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 102-410.
11/05/1991Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/30/1991Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 102-280.
03/20/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber
10/09/1992SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/08/1992SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
10/08/1992SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Voice Vote.
10/08/1992SenateAmendment SP 3439 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
10/08/1992SenateS.Amdt.3439 Amendment SP 3439 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
10/08/1992SenateS.Amdt.3439 Proposed by Senator Ford for Senator Hollings. To make technical and clarifying amendments.
10/08/1992SenateAmendment SP 3439 proposed by Senator Ford for Senator Hollings.
10/08/1992SenateS.Amdt.3438 Amendment SP 3438 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
10/08/1992SenateAmendment SP 3438 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
10/08/1992SenateS.Amdt.3438 Proposed by Senator Ford for Senator Kennedy. In the nature of substitute.
10/08/1992SenateAmendment SP 3438 proposed by Senator Ford for Senator Kennedy.
10/08/1992SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
09/18/1992SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 683.
09/18/1992SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 102-410.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/17/1992SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/12/1991SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
11/05/1991-2:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/05/1991-2:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
11/05/1991-2:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
11/05/1991-2:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
11/05/1991-1:59pmHouseMr. Brooks moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/30/1991HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 169.
10/30/1991HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 102-280.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/29/1991HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/29/1991HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/20/1991HouseReferred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
03/20/1991HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/20/1991 Referred to
10/29/1991 Markup by
10/30/1991 Reported by H.Rept 102-280
Senate Judiciary11/12/1991 Referred to
09/17/1992 Markup by
09/18/1992 Reported by S.Rept 102-410

No related bill information was received for H.R.1537.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1537. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/08/1992)

Codifies existing Federal transportation law relating to: (1) the Department of Transportation; (2) other Government agencies; (3) general and intermodal programs; (4) interstate commerce; (5) rail programs; (6) motor vehicle and driver programs; (7) aviation programs; (8) pipelines; (9) commercial space transportation; (10) bills of lading; (11) contraband; (12) damage to transported property; (13) transportation of animals; (14) payments for inspection and quarantine services; and (15) medals of honor.

Sets forth provisions relating to: (1) ports of entry for civil aircraft; (2) customs violations, including public health, immigration, and controlled substances violations; (3) animal and plant quarantines; and (4) exempting mass transportation from Interstate Commerce Commission jurisdiction.

Repeals various Acts of Congress relating to Federal transportation law.