Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 03/20/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21]* 03/20/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 04/16/1991
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 04/16/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 04/16/1991
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 04/16/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 04/16/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 04/16/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 04/16/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 04/16/1991
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/16/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/16/1991
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 04/16/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 04/16/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/16/1991
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 04/16/1991
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 04/16/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/16/1991
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/16/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 04/16/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 04/16/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 05/14/1991
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 05/14/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 05/14/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 05/14/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 05/14/1991
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/14/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 05/14/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 05/14/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 05/14/1991
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 05/14/1991
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/14/1991
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/14/1991
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 06/12/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 06/12/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 06/12/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 07/23/1991
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 07/23/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 09/11/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 09/11/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/11/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/11/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/11/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 09/11/1991
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 09/11/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/11/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 09/11/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/11/1991
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 09/11/1991
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 09/11/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 09/11/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 10/24/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/29/1992