Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 03/21/1991
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 03/21/1991
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 03/22/1991
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/11/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 04/11/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 06/07/1991
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/04/1992