Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 03/21/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/01/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 05/01/1991
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 05/01/1991
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/01/1991
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 05/01/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/01/1991
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 05/01/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/01/1991
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 05/01/1991
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/01/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/04/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 06/04/1991
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/04/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 06/04/1991
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 06/04/1991
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/04/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 06/04/1991
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 06/04/1991
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 02/20/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/20/1992
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 02/20/1992
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/20/1992
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/20/1992
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 02/27/1992
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 02/27/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 03/18/1992
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/18/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 03/18/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/18/1992
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 04/29/1992
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 04/29/1992
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 04/29/1992
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/29/1992
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 04/29/1992
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/29/1992
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 04/29/1992
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/29/1992
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/13/1992
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 05/13/1992
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 05/13/1992
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 05/13/1992
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 05/13/1992
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/27/1992
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 05/27/1992
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/27/1992
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 05/27/1992
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/27/1992
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 05/28/1992
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 06/03/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/03/1992
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 06/03/1992
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 06/03/1992
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 06/05/1992
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 06/05/1992
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/05/1992
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 06/23/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/23/1992
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/23/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/23/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/23/1992
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/23/1992
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 06/23/1992
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 08/06/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 08/06/1992
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 08/06/1992
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 08/06/1992
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/06/1992
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 08/06/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 08/06/1992
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 08/06/1992