Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 03/22/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/09/1991
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/15/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 05/15/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 08/02/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 08/02/1991
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 08/02/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 08/02/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 08/02/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/26/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/26/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/09/1992
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/09/1992
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/18/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/30/1992
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/12/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 05/12/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 05/12/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 05/27/1992
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 09/09/1992
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 09/18/1992