There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Operation Desert Storm Commemorative Coin Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for minting of coins in commemoration of Operation Desert Storm.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/22/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/15/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Affairs and Coinage.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs
03/22/1991Referred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/22/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (97)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 03/22/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 03/22/1991
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/22/1991
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 03/22/1991
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/09/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 04/09/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 04/09/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 04/09/1991
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 04/09/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/09/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 04/09/1991
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/02/1991
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 05/02/1991
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 05/02/1991
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/02/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/02/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 05/15/1991
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 05/15/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 05/15/1991
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/15/1991

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs03/22/1991 Referred to
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affrs Subcommittee on Consumer Affairs and Coinage04/15/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1658.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1658. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/22/1991)

Operation Desert Storm Commemorative Coin Act - Requires the Secretary of the Treasury to issue one dollar and ten dollar coins emblematic of the United States military's participation in Operation Desert Storm. Prescribes guidelines for the sale of such coins, including the solicitation by the Secretary of the Treasury and the President of the United Service Organizations of bids for proposals from marketing organizations to implement a coin marketing agreement.

Mandates that such agreement not indicate in any manner that any portion of the sales price to the public constitutes a tax deductible contribution. Sets forth a surcharge distribution scheme.

Mandates that: (1) all amounts received from the sale of such coins be deposited in the coinage profit fund; and (2) the minting and issuing of such coins not result in any net cost to the Federal Government.