There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of State, together with the Attorney General, to enter into negotiations with other countries to provide for the incarceration in those countries of illegal aliens in the United States imprisoned for Federal offenses.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/10/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
10/31/1991Unfavorable Executive Comment Received from State.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/30/1991Executive Comment Requested from State.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
04/22/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on International Operations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
04/16/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on International Law, Immigration, and Refugees.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/10/1991Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/1991Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/10/1991 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on International Operations04/22/1991 Referred to
House Judiciary04/10/1991 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on International Law, Immigration, and Refugees04/16/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1704.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1704. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/10/1991)

Directs the Secretary of State, together with the Attorney General, to enter into negotiations with any country for an agreement to provide for the incarceration in such country (for the duration of a prison term to which the individual was sentenced in the United States) of any individual who: (1) is a national of such country; (2) is an illegal alien in the United States or on the basis of conviction of a Federal or State criminal offense, is subject to deportation; and (3) is incarcerated in a Federal prison facility for a Federal criminal offense. Requires the Secretary to give priority to negotiating with a country if the number of individuals who are nationals of such country represent a large percentage of individuals meeting such criteria.

Permits such agreements to provide for the contribution of U.S. funds to a country for the construction of prison facilities for individuals transferred from the United States or for other expenses incurred in imprisoning such individuals.

Authorizes appropriations.