There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To correct the tariff rate inversion on certain iron and steel pipe and tube products.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/11/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
10/05/1992See H.R.5100.
02/26/1992See H.R.4318.
11/22/1991Unfavorable Executive Comment Received from USTR.
07/05/1991Executive Comment Received from ITC.
05/10/1991Executive Comment Requested from Treasury, Commerce, ITC, USTR.
04/16/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/11/1991Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/11/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/11/1991 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade04/16/1991 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1749. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/11/1991)

Amends the Harmonized Tariff Schedule of the United States to revise a specified subheading relating to nonalloy iron and steel pipes and tubes to include non-galvanized forms of such products. Increases the duty on certain other iron and steel pipes and tubes.

Imposes a duty on galvanized nonalloy iron and steel pipes and tubes having a specified thickness.

Increases the duty on certain stainless steel pipes and tubes.

Authorizes the U.S. Trade Representative to negotiate compensation for claims made pursuant to the General Agreement on Tariffs and Trade, or any other trade agreement to which the United States is a party, as a result of the amendments made by this Act.