There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate a clinical wing at the Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center in Salem, Virginia, as the "Hugh Davis Memorial Wing".


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/29/1991Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
07/25/1991Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 102-165.
01/03/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
07/30/1991SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
07/29/1991-1:12pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/29/1991-1:12pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
07/29/1991-1:03pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
07/29/1991-1:03pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
07/29/1991-1:03pmHouseMr. Montgomery moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/25/1991HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 46.
07/25/1991HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 102-165.
07/23/1991HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/23/1991HouseOrdered to be Reported.
01/03/1991HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
01/03/1991HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/05/1991
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/05/1991
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 02/05/1991
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/05/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/05/1991
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 02/05/1991
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/05/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/05/1991
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/05/1991
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 07/25/1991
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/25/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 07/25/1991
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 07/25/1991
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 07/25/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/25/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/25/1991
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/25/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/25/1991
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 07/25/1991
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 07/25/1991
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/25/1991
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 07/25/1991
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 07/25/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 07/25/1991
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/25/1991
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 07/25/1991
Rep. Nichols, Dick [R-KS-5] 07/25/1991
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 07/25/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 07/25/1991
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 07/25/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 07/25/1991
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 07/25/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 07/25/1991
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/25/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 07/25/1991
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 07/25/1991
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 07/25/1991
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/25/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/25/1991
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/25/1991
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/25/1991

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs01/03/1991 Referred to
07/23/1991 Markup by
07/25/1991 Reported by H.Rept 102-165
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/30/1991 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.175. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/1991)

Designates the clinical wing at the Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center in Salem, Virginia, as the Hugh Davis Memorial Wing.