Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 04/16/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/16/1991
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/16/1991
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 04/16/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/01/1991
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/01/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 05/01/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 05/01/1991
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 06/11/1991
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 06/26/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/26/1991
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 07/24/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 08/01/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 08/01/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 08/01/1991
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 08/02/1991
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16] 10/02/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/02/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 11/19/1991
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 11/19/1991
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 02/03/1992
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 02/03/1992
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 04/07/1992
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 04/09/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 04/29/1992

Show cosponsors who withdrew