There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the opening of the Woodrow Wilson Memorial Bridge except during certain periods of times.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/16/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
06/22/1992Similar Provisions Incorporated in H.R.5055.
01/27/1992Unfavorable Executive Comment Received from DOT.
01/27/1992Unfavorable Executive Comment Received from DOT.
04/29/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Surface Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
04/22/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Navigation.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
04/22/1991Executive Comment Requested from DOT.
04/16/1991Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/16/1991Referred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/16/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 05/01/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/01/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 05/07/1991
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/04/1992

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries04/16/1991 Referred to
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Navigation04/22/1991 Referred to
House Public Works and Transportation04/16/1991 Referred to
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Surface Transportation04/29/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1801.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1801. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/16/1991)

Directs the Secretary of Transportation to prohibit the the opening of the drawbridge of the Woodrow Wilson Memorial Bridge for marine traffic except during the period of 12:00 p.m. (midnight) to 4:00 a.m. or emergency situations.