There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To limit the growth in the number of civilian employees within each branch of the Government.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/17/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
06/07/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Intellectual Property and Judicial Administration.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/24/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Personnel and Police.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
04/23/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
04/17/1991Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/1991Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/1991Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (13)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Administration04/17/1991 Referred to
House Administration Subcommittee on Personnel and Police04/24/1991 Referred to
House Judiciary04/17/1991 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Intellectual Property and Judicial Administration06/07/1991 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service04/17/1991 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Human Resources04/23/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1897.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1897. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/17/1991)

Limits the total numbers of civilian employees in each branch of the Government on September 30th of 1994 and each year thereafter, to the number in such branch on September 30, 1990. Suspends such limitation during a war or a national emergency. Prohibits attaining compliance with such mandate through any involuntary separations. Exempts from such mandate employees within the executive branch who are law enforcement officers or who are involved in the delivery of health care services and employees of the Central Intelligence Agency, the Defense Intelligence Agency, or the National Security Agency.