There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To suspend temporarily the duty on certain fine fabrics of wool or fine animal hair.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/18/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
09/02/1992Executive Comment Received from ITC.
11/21/1991Executive Comment Received from Commerce.
05/10/1991Executive Comment Requested from Treasury, Commerce, ITC, USTR.
04/25/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/18/1991Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/18/1991 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade04/25/1991 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1958. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/18/1991)

Amends the Harmonized Tariff Schedule of the United States to define the term "number" with respect to certain fabrics of wool or fine animal hair to mean the average yarn number of the yarns contained in such items. Sets forth a specified formula for computing such number.

Decreases, through December 31, 1995, the duty on fabrics of wool or fine animal hair numbered 70 to 79. Suspends, through December 31, 1994, the duty on such fabrics numbered 80 or higher.