Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 04/22/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 04/22/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 04/23/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 04/23/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/24/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 04/24/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 04/25/1991
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 05/14/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 05/14/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/14/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 05/14/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/14/1991
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 06/05/1991
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 06/05/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 06/20/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 06/20/1991
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 07/17/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/24/1991
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 07/31/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 07/31/1991
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 07/31/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/31/1991
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 09/11/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 09/11/1991
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/25/1991
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/25/1991
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 09/25/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 10/03/1991
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 11/18/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 11/18/1991
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/18/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 11/18/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 11/18/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 01/30/1992
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/30/1992
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 01/30/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/30/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 02/27/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 02/27/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/27/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 02/27/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/27/1992
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 02/27/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 02/27/1992
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 02/27/1992
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 03/20/1992
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 03/20/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/07/1992
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 04/07/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 05/05/1992
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 05/05/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 05/06/1992
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/11/1992
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/20/1992
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/20/1992
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/20/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/17/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/17/1992
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/17/1992
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/17/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/25/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 06/25/1992
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/25/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/25/1992
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 07/08/1992
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 07/08/1992
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 07/08/1992
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 07/09/1992
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/09/1992