Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 01/12/1991
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 01/12/1991
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 01/12/1991
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 01/12/1991
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/12/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 01/12/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 01/12/1991
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 01/12/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 01/12/1991
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 01/12/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 01/12/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 01/12/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 01/12/1991
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 01/12/1991
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 01/12/1991
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 01/12/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 01/12/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 01/12/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 01/12/1991
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 01/12/1991
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 01/12/1991
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 01/12/1991
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 01/12/1991
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 01/12/1991
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 01/12/1991
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-13] 01/12/1991
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 01/12/1991
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 01/12/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/12/1991
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/12/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 01/12/1991
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 01/12/1991
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 01/12/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 01/12/1991
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 01/12/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 01/12/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 01/12/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/12/1991
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 01/12/1991
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 01/12/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 01/12/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 01/12/1991
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 01/12/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 01/12/1991
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 01/12/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/12/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/12/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/12/1991
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 01/12/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 01/12/1991
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 01/12/1991
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 01/12/1991
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 01/12/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 01/12/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 01/12/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 01/12/1991
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 01/12/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 01/12/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 01/12/1991
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 01/12/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 01/12/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 01/12/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 01/12/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 01/12/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 01/12/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 01/12/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 01/12/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 01/12/1991
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 01/12/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/12/1991
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 01/12/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/12/1991
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 01/12/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 01/12/1991
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 01/12/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 01/12/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/12/1991
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 01/12/1991
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 01/12/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 01/12/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 01/12/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 01/12/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 01/12/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 01/12/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/12/1991
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 01/12/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/12/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/12/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/12/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 01/12/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 01/12/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 01/12/1991
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 01/12/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 01/12/1991
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 01/12/1991
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 01/12/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 01/12/1991
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 01/12/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/12/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 01/12/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/12/1991
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 01/12/1991
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 01/12/1991
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 01/12/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 01/12/1991
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 01/12/1991
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 01/12/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 01/12/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 01/12/1991
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 01/12/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 01/12/1991
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-29] 01/12/1991
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 01/12/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 01/12/1991
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 01/12/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 01/12/1991
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 01/12/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 01/12/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 01/12/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 01/12/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 01/12/1991
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 01/12/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 01/12/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 01/24/1991
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 01/24/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/24/1991
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/24/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/24/1991
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 01/24/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 01/24/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 01/24/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 01/24/1991
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 02/20/1991
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/20/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/20/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/20/1991
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 02/20/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 02/20/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 02/20/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 02/20/1991
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 02/20/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 02/20/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/20/1991
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 02/20/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/20/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 02/20/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 02/20/1991
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 02/20/1991
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/20/1991
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/20/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 02/20/1991
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 02/20/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/20/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 02/20/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 02/20/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/20/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/20/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/20/1991
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 02/20/1991
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 02/20/1991
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16] 03/07/1991
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/07/1991
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/07/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/07/1991
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 03/07/1991
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 03/07/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 03/21/1991
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/21/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 04/11/1991
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 04/11/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/11/1991
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/17/1991
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 04/17/1991
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 04/25/1991
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/27/1991