Committees: H.R.2056 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/24/1991 Referred to
10/16/1991 Markup by
11/04/1991 Reported by H.Rept 102-284 Part 1
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade04/30/1991 Referred to
07/09/1991 Hearings by
07/11/1991 Markup by
07/11/1991 Reported by
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries11/04/1991 Referred to
02/27/1992 Markup by
03/06/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-284 Part 2
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Merchant Marine11/22/1991 Referred to
02/19/1992 Hearings by
02/27/1992 Discharged from
Senate Finance05/19/1992 Referred to