Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2]* 04/30/1991
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/30/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 06/05/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 06/05/1991
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 06/05/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/05/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 06/05/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/05/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 06/05/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 07/15/1991
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 07/15/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 07/15/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 07/15/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 07/15/1991
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 07/15/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/15/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 07/15/1991
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 07/15/1991
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 07/18/1991
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 07/18/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/18/1991
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 07/18/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 07/18/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/25/1991
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 07/25/1991
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 07/25/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/25/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/25/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 07/25/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 07/25/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 07/25/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 07/25/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 07/25/1991
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 07/31/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 07/31/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 07/31/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 07/31/1991
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 07/31/1991
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/31/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/31/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 09/23/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/23/1991
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 09/23/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/23/1991
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 09/23/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 09/23/1991