Committees: H.R.2152 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries04/30/1991 Referred to
10/03/1991 Markup by
10/22/1991 Reported by H.Rept 102-262 Part 1
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment05/03/1991 Referred to
08/06/1991 Hearings by
09/26/1991 Markup by
09/26/1991 Reported by
House Ways and Means10/22/1991 Referred to
02/12/1992 Markup by
02/19/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-262 Part 2