Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 05/23/1991
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 05/23/1991
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/23/1991
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 05/23/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 05/23/1991
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/23/1991
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/23/1991
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/23/1991
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 05/23/1991
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/23/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 05/23/1991
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/23/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 05/23/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/23/1991
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 05/23/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/23/1991
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 05/23/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 07/09/1991
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 07/09/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 07/09/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/09/1991
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/09/1991
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/09/1991
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 07/09/1991
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 07/09/1991
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 07/09/1991
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 10/22/1991
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 10/22/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 10/22/1991
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 10/22/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 10/22/1991
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 11/12/1991
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 11/14/1991
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 11/19/1991
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 11/20/1991