Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 05/02/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-29]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 05/02/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 05/15/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/15/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/15/1991
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/15/1991
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/15/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/15/1991
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 05/15/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/15/1991
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 05/15/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 05/15/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/15/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/15/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/15/1991
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 05/15/1991
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 05/15/1991
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 05/15/1991
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 05/15/1991
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 05/15/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 05/15/1991
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 05/15/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 05/15/1991
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 05/15/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 05/15/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/20/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 05/20/1991
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 05/20/1991
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 05/20/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/20/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 05/20/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/20/1991
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/20/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 05/20/1991
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/20/1991
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/20/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/20/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/20/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 05/20/1991
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/20/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 05/20/1991
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/20/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 05/20/1991
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/05/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/05/1991
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/05/1991
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 06/05/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 06/05/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/05/1991
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 06/05/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 06/05/1991
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/05/1991
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44] 06/05/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 06/05/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/05/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/05/1991
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 06/05/1991
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 06/05/1991
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 06/05/1991
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 06/05/1991
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/05/1991
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 06/05/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 06/05/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/05/1991
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/05/1991
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 06/05/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/05/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 06/05/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 06/05/1991
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 06/05/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 06/05/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/05/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/11/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 06/11/1991
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/11/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 06/11/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 06/11/1991
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 06/11/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 06/11/1991
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 06/11/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 06/11/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/11/1991
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 06/19/1991
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 06/19/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 06/19/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 06/19/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 06/19/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/19/1991
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/25/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/25/1991
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/26/1991