There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Primary Care Training Amendments of 1991

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to establish, in the program of grants regarding training in general internal medicine and general pediatrics, certain requirements regarding training in family medicine.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/07/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/20/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/07/1991Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/07/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 05/07/1991
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 05/07/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 05/23/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 05/23/1991
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 05/23/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/23/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/05/1991
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 06/05/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 06/05/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/05/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 06/11/1991
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 06/11/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 07/24/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 07/24/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/24/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/24/1991
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16] 09/17/1991

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/07/1991 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment05/20/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2231.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2231. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/07/1991)

Primary Care Training Amendments of 1991 - Amends provisions of the Public Health Service Act authorizing grants and contracts for training, traineeships, and fellowships in general internal medicine and general pediatrics to require that a school, hospital, or other entity, in order to receive a grant or contract, provide certain types of training related to family medicine. Adds demonstration of a commitment to family medicine to the criteria for establishing priority in making the grants and contracts.