There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 4038 of the Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1987 to permit rural health medical education demonstration projects to be conducted by a consortium including a rural hospital and to authorize appropriations for expenses of such projects not reimbursed under the medicare program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/07/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/20/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/07/1991Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/07/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 05/07/1991
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 05/07/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 05/07/1991
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 05/14/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 05/14/1991
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 05/14/1991
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 05/14/1991
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 05/14/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 05/14/1991
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 05/14/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/30/1991
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/30/1991
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 07/16/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 07/16/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 07/16/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 07/16/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 07/16/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/16/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 09/11/1991
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16] 09/11/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/11/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 02/05/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/07/1991 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment05/20/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2233.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2233. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/07/1991)

Amends the Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1987 to allow a consortium including one or more rural hospitals (including at least a small rural hospital and/or one or more rural health clinics) to participate in the rural health medical education demonstration project of the Department of Health and Human Services. Authorizes appropriations as necessary to pay costs of such project which are attributable to travel and living expenses of medical residents and travel expenses of supervising physicians, to the extent such costs are not reimbursed under the Medicare program.