Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/14/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/14/1991
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/20/1991
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 05/23/1991
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/03/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 06/03/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/04/1991
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 06/04/1991
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 06/07/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/07/1991
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 06/18/1991
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 06/26/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/09/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 07/09/1991
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/10/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 07/10/1991
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/30/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 08/01/1991
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 09/11/1991
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/11/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 09/11/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 09/11/1991
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 09/11/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/11/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/11/1991
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 09/11/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 09/11/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/11/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/11/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 09/11/1991
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 09/17/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/17/1991
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 09/17/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 09/17/1991
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 09/17/1991
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/17/1991
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 09/23/1991
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/23/1991
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/23/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/23/1991
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 09/23/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 09/23/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 09/23/1991
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 09/23/1991
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/23/1991
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 09/24/1991
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 09/25/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 10/01/1991
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 10/01/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 10/01/1991
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 10/01/1991
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 10/01/1991
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/01/1991
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 10/01/1991
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/01/1991
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 10/01/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 10/01/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 10/03/1991
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 10/03/1991
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 10/03/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 10/03/1991
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/03/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 10/08/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/08/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 10/08/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 10/08/1991
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 10/08/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 10/15/1991
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 10/15/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 10/15/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 10/15/1991
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/15/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/15/1991
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 10/15/1991
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/15/1991
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/17/1991
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/17/1991
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 10/17/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/17/1991
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/17/1991
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/17/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 10/22/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/22/1991
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3] 10/22/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/29/1991
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 10/29/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/29/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 10/29/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/29/1991
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 10/29/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 10/29/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/04/1991
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 11/04/1991
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 11/04/1991
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 11/04/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/07/1991
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/07/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 11/07/1991
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 11/07/1991
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 11/13/1991
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 11/13/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 11/13/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 11/13/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/19/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/26/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 11/26/1991
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 11/26/1991
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 11/26/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 01/28/1992
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 01/28/1992
Rep. Luken, Charles [D-OH-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 01/28/1992
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 01/28/1992
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 01/28/1992
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 01/28/1992
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 01/28/1992
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 01/28/1992
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 01/28/1992
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 01/28/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 01/28/1992
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 02/04/1992
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/04/1992
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/04/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 02/25/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 02/25/1992
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/25/1992
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/05/1992
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 03/05/1992
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 03/05/1992
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 03/11/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/11/1992
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/18/1992
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44] 04/08/1992
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/08/1992
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 04/08/1992
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/08/1992
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/28/1992
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 04/28/1992
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/06/1992
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 05/12/1992
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 05/19/1992
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 06/10/1992
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 07/22/1992
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 08/05/1992
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 08/11/1992
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 08/12/1992
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 08/12/1992
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 08/12/1992
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/10/1992
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/22/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/22/1992
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 09/25/1992