Committees: H.R.2321 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs05/14/1991 Referred to
02/05/1992 Markup by
03/02/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-449
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands05/21/1991 Referred to
08/01/1991 Hearings by
11/26/1991 Markup by
11/26/1991 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/10/1992 Referred to
09/22/1992 Markup by
09/24/1992 Reported by S.Rept 102-462
09/09/1992 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests03/11/1992 Referred to