Summary: H.R.232 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (05/16/1991)

Amends Federal veterans' benefits provisions to provide that, after FY 1990, the limitation on the number of homes purchased by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs for which loan guaranty defaults occurred which may be financed by a loan made by the Secretary shall cease to have effect. Provides that, as of October 1, 1990, the Secretary may sell any note evidencing such a loan with or without recourse if the amount received is not less than the unpaid balance of such loan. Repeals the current December 31, 1990 termination date of such property management provisions.

Extends through December 31, 1992, current provisions relating to default procedures and the procedure for real estate appraisals to be followed by the Secretary.

Directs the Secretary, no later than April 30 of each year following a year in which the Secretary authorizes lenders to determine the reasonable value of property for appraisal purposes, to report to the veterans' committees on the exercise of such authority during that year.

Directs the Secretary, at the request of the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development (HUD), to certify whether an applicant for assistance under laws administered by HUD is a veteran.

Provides that an applicant for a loan made, guaranteed, or insured by the Department of Veterans Affairs shall not be subject to reporting requirements applicable to requests for, or receipts of, Federal contracts, grants, loans, or cooperative agreements except to the extent that those requirements are provided for in, or by the Secretary pursuant to, the veterans' housing loan guaranty program.

Revises procedures concerning the application made by a veteran to the Secretary for waiver of repayment of any overpayment of benefits made by the Department to a veteran when it is determined that such recovery would be against equity and good conscience.

Strikes a $144,000 limit on the amount of a housing loan automatically guaranteed by the United States for an eligible veteran's housing loan.

Authorizes the Secretary, during FY 1992 through 1994, to carry out a compensated work therapy and therapeutic transitional housing demonstration program (program). Makes eligible for the program veterans who are furnishing therapeutic and rehabilitative activities through the Department or who are furnished therapeutic work pursuant to activities provided through the Department for such purpose. Authorizes the Secretary, under such program, to operate residences as therapeutic transitional housing solely for such eligible veterans. Limits to 50 the number of such residences authorized to be operated. Authorizes the Secretary to contract with non-profit corporations to conduct compensated work therapy programs under the program. Outlines contracting conditions. Authorizes the contract to allow for the Secretary to furnish the corporation with in-kind services. Allows the Secretary to use procurement procedures to purchase or lease residential housing for the purposes of the program. Outlines conditions for such transitional housing, including the payment of rent for resident veterans. Requires a house manager for each residence used for such housing. Authorizes the Secretary to use any suitable residential property for such housing, including property acquired through default of loans under the veterans' home loan guaranty program. Requires the Secretary to prescribe: (1) a procedure for establishing reasonable rental rates for veterans residing in such housing; and (2) appropriate limits on the period such veterans may reside in such housing. Authorizes the Secretary to dispose of property after use as such housing and to deposit the proceeds into the General Post Fund of the Department. Requires the Secretary to report on the operation of such program after two years of its existence.

Authorizes the Secretary to make loans to assist nonprofit organizations in providing transitional housing for veterans who are or recently have been in a program for the treatment of substance abuse. Outlines terms, conditions, and limitations of such loan program. Requires the Secretary to report on the experience of the program 15 months after the first loan under the program is granted.

Authorizes the Secretary to enter into agreements with nonprofit organizations and States or political subdivisions to sell real property acquired as the result of a default on a loan made, insured, or guaranteed by the Secretary under the veterans' home loan guaranty program. Provides the following conditions for such agreements: (1) that the Secretary determines that such action will not adversely affect the ability of the Department to fulfill its statutory mission with respect to the veterans' home loan guaranty program; (2) that the entity to which the property is sold agrees to utilize such property solely as a shelter primarily for homeless veterans and their families, to comply with all zoning laws, and to make no use of the property that is incompatible with the area; and (3) that the Secretary determines that there is no significant likelihood of the property being sold for a price sufficient to reduce the liability of the Department or the veteran who defaulted on the loan. Terminates such authority after FY 1993.

Authorizes the Secretary to contract for the provision of rehabilitative and therapeutic services to veterans with any appropriate source, whether or not such source is an element of the Department or any other Federal entity. (Current law allows such contractual arrangements with private industry or other sources outside the Department.)

Authorizes the Secretary to provide for flat grave markers in the section of the Florida National Cemetery in which preplaced grave liners were installed before July 30, 1988.

Authorizes the Secretary to carry out an administrative reorganization involving the realignment of management responsibility for the Department's data processing centers, together with corresponding realignments of information resources management components and functions within the Department's central office, as described in a detailed plan and justification in January, 1991.

Amends various Federal codified provisions to reflect the conversion of the Veterans Administration to the Department of Veterans Affairs, and makes technical amendments to Federal veterans' benefits provisions and statutory law.

Provides for credits to the Guaranty and Indemnity Fund in specified amounts depending on the fiscal year made in the case of a guaranteed or insured loan for a home purchase or for construction with respect to which a veteran has made a down payment of ten percent or more of the total purchase price. Ratifies certain actions and inactions taken by the Secretary or the Secretary of the Treasury with respect to such loans and their fees when taken between October 1, 1990, and the date of enactment of this Act.