There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Rural Clinical Laboratory Personnel Shortage Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to provide for an increase in the number of qualified allied health professionals serving in technical positions in clinical laboratories serving rural areas, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/20/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/10/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/20/1991Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/20/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 05/20/1991
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 05/20/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 05/20/1991
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 06/03/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/03/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 06/03/1991
Rep. Nichols, Dick [R-KS-5] 06/03/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/03/1991
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/03/1991
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 06/03/1991
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/03/1991
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/03/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/03/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 06/03/1991
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/03/1991
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/18/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 06/18/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/10/1991
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 07/10/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 07/10/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 07/10/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/10/1991
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 07/10/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 07/10/1991
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 07/10/1991

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/20/1991 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment06/10/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2405.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2405. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/20/1991)

Rural Clinical Laboratory Personnel Shortage Act - Amends the Public Health Service Act to establish a program of contracts under which allied health professionals agree to serve in technical positions as employees in clinical laboratories that serve rural areas with shortages of employees in such positions in consideration of the Federal Government paying a limited amount of the principal and interest of the educational loans of the professionals. Authorizes appropriations.

Mandates grants and contracts for the education and training of clinical laboratory personnel. Authorizes appropriations.

Requires a program for the accreditation of entities engaged in the certification of clinical laboratory personnel. Provides, until establishment of accreditation standards, for a competency-based examination to determine the proficiency of individuals who do not meet formal educational qualifications.