There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Congressional Recycling Act of 1991

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require Congress to purchase recycled paper and paper products to the greatest extent practicable.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/21/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Procurement and Printing.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
01/03/1991Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (94)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 01/10/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 01/10/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/10/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/10/1991
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 01/10/1991
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 01/10/1991
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 01/10/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/10/1991
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20] 01/10/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 01/10/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 01/10/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 01/10/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 01/10/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 01/10/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/10/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 01/10/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 01/10/1991
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 01/10/1991
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 01/10/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 01/10/1991
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 01/10/1991
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 01/10/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 01/10/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 01/10/1991
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 01/10/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 01/10/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 01/10/1991
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 01/10/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 01/10/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 01/10/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 04/25/1991
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 04/25/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 04/25/1991
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 04/25/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 04/25/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 04/25/1991
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/25/1991
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 04/25/1991
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16] 04/25/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 04/25/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 04/25/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 04/25/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 04/25/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 04/25/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 04/25/1991
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 04/25/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 04/25/1991
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 04/25/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/25/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/25/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 04/25/1991
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/25/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 04/25/1991
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 04/25/1991
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 04/25/1991
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 04/25/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 04/25/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 04/25/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 04/25/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/25/1991
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 04/25/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/25/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/25/1991
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/25/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 04/25/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 04/25/1991
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 04/25/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 04/25/1991
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 04/25/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/25/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 04/25/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 04/25/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/25/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 04/25/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/25/1991
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 04/25/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/25/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/25/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 04/25/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 04/25/1991
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 04/25/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 04/25/1991
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 04/25/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 04/25/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/25/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/25/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 04/25/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/25/1991
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/25/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 04/25/1991
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 04/25/1991
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 05/29/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/29/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/29/1991

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration01/03/1991 Referred to
House Administration Subcommittee on Procurement and Printing02/21/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.242.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.242. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/1991)

Congressional Recycling Act of 1991 - Requires the Clerk of the House of Representatives and the Secretary of the Senate to purchase recycled paper and paper products for use to the greatest extent practicable in the operations of the House and the Senate.

Directs the Public Printer to assure that the Government Printing Office uses recycled paper in providing services to the House.

Directs the Clerk of the House and the Secretary of the Senate to determine the price or range of prices to be considered unreasonable for purposes of this Act.