Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 05/23/1991
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/23/1991
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8]* 05/23/1991
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2]* 05/23/1991
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 05/23/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/23/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 05/23/1991
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/23/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14]* 05/23/1991
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 05/23/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/04/1991
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 06/04/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/04/1991
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/13/1991
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/13/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/13/1991
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/17/1991
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/17/1991
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/17/1991
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/17/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 07/17/1991
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 07/24/1991
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 07/24/1991
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/24/1991
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 07/24/1991
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/24/1991
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 08/02/1991
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/17/1991
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 09/17/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 10/08/1991
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 10/08/1991
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 10/08/1991
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 10/29/1991
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 10/29/1991
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 11/19/1991
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 01/28/1992
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 01/28/1992
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 03/30/1992
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/04/1992
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 05/04/1992