Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/21/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 06/05/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 06/05/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 06/05/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/12/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 09/25/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/25/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/23/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 11/08/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 01/28/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 01/28/1992