Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 06/19/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 06/19/1991
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 06/19/1991
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/19/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 06/19/1991
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 07/09/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 07/09/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 07/09/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 07/09/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/24/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 07/24/1991
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 07/24/1991
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 07/24/1991
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 07/24/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/24/1991
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/24/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 07/24/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 08/01/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 08/01/1991
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/01/1991
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 08/01/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 08/01/1991
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 08/01/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 08/01/1991
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 08/02/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 08/02/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 08/02/1991
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 08/02/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 09/24/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/24/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 09/24/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 09/24/1991
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/24/1991
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 09/24/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/24/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 09/24/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/24/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/24/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 09/24/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 09/24/1991
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 09/24/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 09/24/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 09/24/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/24/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/24/1991
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/24/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 09/24/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 09/24/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 09/24/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 09/24/1991
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 09/24/1991
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 09/24/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 09/24/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/24/1991
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/24/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/24/1991
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 09/24/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 09/24/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 10/03/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 10/03/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/03/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/03/1991
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 10/03/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 10/03/1991
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/03/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 10/03/1991
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 10/03/1991
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 10/03/1991
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 10/03/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 10/03/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 10/03/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 10/03/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 10/22/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 10/22/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 11/04/1991
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 11/04/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/04/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 11/04/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 11/04/1991
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 11/13/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 11/13/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 11/13/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 11/22/1991
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/26/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 11/26/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/26/1991
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 01/28/1992
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 01/28/1992
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 02/27/1992
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 03/04/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 03/04/1992
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 03/20/1992
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/20/1992
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 05/20/1992

Show cosponsors who withdrew