Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 06/19/1991
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 06/19/1991
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/19/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 06/19/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 07/09/1991
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/09/1991
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 07/09/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/09/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/24/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/24/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 07/24/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 07/24/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 07/25/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 08/02/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 09/24/1991
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 09/24/1991
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 09/24/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 09/24/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 09/24/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 09/24/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 09/24/1991
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/24/1991
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 09/24/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/24/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 09/24/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 09/24/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 09/24/1991
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 09/24/1991
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 09/24/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 09/24/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/24/1991
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/24/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/24/1991
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 09/24/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 09/24/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 10/03/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 10/03/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/03/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/03/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 10/03/1991
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 10/03/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 10/03/1991
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 10/03/1991
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 10/03/1991
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/03/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 10/03/1991
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 10/03/1991
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 10/03/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 10/03/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 10/03/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 10/03/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 10/22/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 11/04/1991
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 11/04/1991
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 11/13/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 11/20/1991
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 11/22/1991
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 01/28/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/28/1992
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 02/27/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/20/1992