There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the conveyance to the Columbia Hospital for Women of certain parcels of land in the District of Columbia, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/06/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date
11/13/1991Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds
11/07/1991Clean Bill, H.R. 3703 Reported in Lieu.
11/07/1991Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/25/1991Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House District of Columbia Subcommittee on Fiscal Affairs and Health
09/25/1991Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House District of Columbia Subcommittee on Fiscal Affairs and Health
09/12/1991Unfavorable Executive Comment Received from GSA.
06/20/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
06/20/1991Executive Comment Requested from GSA.
06/12/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Activities and Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Government Operations
06/07/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Fiscal Affairs and Health.
Action By: Committee on District of Columbia
06/06/1991Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/1991Referred to the House Committee on Government Operations.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/1991Referred to the House Committee on District of Columbia.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House District of Columbia06/06/1991 Referred to
11/07/1991 Markup by
House District of Columbia Subcommittee on Fiscal Affairs and Health06/07/1991 Referred to
09/25/1991 Markup by
09/25/1991 Reported by
House Government Operations06/06/1991 Referred to
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Government Activities and Transportation06/12/1991 Referred to
House Public Works and Transportation06/06/1991 Referred to
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds06/20/1991 Referred to
11/13/1991 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2570. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/06/1991)

Directs the Administrator of General Services to convey specified lands in the District of Columbia to the Columbia Hospital for Women. Requires that such lands be used for medical purposes, unless use for such other purpose is approved by the Administrator or by Act of Congress. Retains for the United States the right to use the building and parking lot on such lands until the Hospital provides one-year notice of its need for such facilities.

Directs the Hospital to establish at least three satellite health centers to provide health and counseling services for teenagers, pregnant women, and mothers and children.