Committees: H.R.2607 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/11/1991 Referred to
07/30/1991 Markup by
09/16/1991 Reported by H.Rept 102-205
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials06/24/1991 Referred to
06/24/1991 Hearings by
07/11/1991 Markup by
07/11/1991 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation09/24/1991 Referred to
03/18/1992 Discharged from