Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 02/06/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/06/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/06/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 02/06/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 02/06/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 02/06/1991
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/06/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/06/1991
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 02/06/1991
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 02/06/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 03/05/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/05/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 03/05/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/05/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/05/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 03/05/1991
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/05/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 03/05/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/05/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/05/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 03/05/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 03/05/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 03/05/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 03/05/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/05/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 03/05/1991
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/05/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/05/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/05/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/05/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 03/05/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 03/05/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/05/1991
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 03/05/1991
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/05/1991
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 03/05/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 03/05/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 03/05/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 03/05/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/05/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 03/05/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 03/05/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 03/05/1991
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 03/05/1991
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 03/05/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/05/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/05/1991
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 03/05/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 03/05/1991
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/05/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/05/1991
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 03/05/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/05/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/05/1991
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 04/16/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/16/1991
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 04/16/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 04/16/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 04/16/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/16/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/16/1991
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 04/16/1991
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 04/16/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/16/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/16/1991
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/16/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 04/16/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 04/16/1991
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 04/16/1991
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/16/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 04/16/1991
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 05/29/1991
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 05/29/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/29/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 05/29/1991
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 05/29/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 05/29/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 05/29/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 05/29/1991
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/29/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 05/29/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 05/29/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/29/1991
Rep. Luken, Charles [D-OH-1] 06/25/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/25/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 06/25/1991
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 06/25/1991
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/25/1991
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 06/25/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 06/25/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 06/25/1991
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 06/25/1991
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 06/25/1991
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/25/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 06/25/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/25/1991
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 06/25/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/25/1991
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/25/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 06/25/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/25/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/25/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 07/11/1991
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 07/11/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/11/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/11/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/11/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 07/11/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/11/1991
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/11/1991
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 07/11/1991
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 07/11/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/17/1991
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 07/17/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 07/17/1991
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 07/17/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 07/17/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 07/17/1991
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/17/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 07/17/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 08/02/1991
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 08/02/1991
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 08/02/1991
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 08/02/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 08/02/1991
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 08/02/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 08/02/1991
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 08/02/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/25/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 09/25/1991
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 09/25/1991
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 09/25/1991
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 09/25/1991
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/25/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 09/25/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 09/25/1991
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 09/25/1991
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 10/31/1991
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 10/31/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 10/31/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/31/1991
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/31/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 10/31/1991
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 10/31/1991
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/31/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 01/03/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 01/03/1992
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 01/03/1992
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 01/03/1992
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 01/03/1992
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 01/03/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 01/03/1992
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/03/1992
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 02/03/1992
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/03/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 02/03/1992
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 04/07/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/07/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/04/1992
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 07/24/1992

Show cosponsors who withdrew