There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Paperwork Reduction in Health Care Act of 1991

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 44, United States Code, to provide for improved identification and assessment of the paperwork burden imposed on beneficiaries of health care services and providers of such services, and to provide for the reduction of such burden.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/12/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/17/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Information, Justice and Agriculture.
Action By: Committee on Government Operations
06/12/1991Referred to the House Committee on Government Operations.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (74)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 07/10/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/10/1991
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/10/1991
Rep. Nichols, Dick [R-KS-5] 07/10/1991
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 07/10/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 07/10/1991
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/10/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 07/10/1991
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 07/10/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 07/10/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 07/10/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 07/10/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/10/1991
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 08/02/1991
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 08/02/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 08/02/1991
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/02/1991
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 08/02/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 08/02/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 08/02/1991
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 08/02/1991
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 08/02/1991
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 08/02/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 08/02/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 08/02/1991
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 10/03/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 10/03/1991
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/03/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/03/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 10/03/1991
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 10/03/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 11/08/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 11/08/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 11/08/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 11/08/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 11/08/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 11/08/1991
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 11/08/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/08/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 11/08/1991
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 11/08/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 11/08/1991
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 11/26/1991
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 11/26/1991
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 11/26/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/26/1991
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 11/26/1991
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 11/26/1991
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 11/26/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 11/26/1991
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 11/26/1991
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 11/26/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 11/26/1991
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 11/26/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 03/12/1992
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 03/12/1992
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 03/12/1992
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 03/12/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 03/12/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 03/12/1992
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/12/1992
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 08/06/1992
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 08/06/1992
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 08/06/1992
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 08/06/1992
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 08/06/1992
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 08/06/1992
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 08/06/1992
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 08/06/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Operations06/12/1991 Referred to
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Government Information, Justice, and Agriculture06/17/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2625.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2625. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/12/1991)

Paperwork Reduction in Health Care Act of 1991 - Requires the Director of the Office of Management and Budget to: (1) identify, inventory, and assess the Federal paperwork burden associated with health care services; and (2) establish a goal for reducing such burden in each of FY 1992 through 1997 by at least five percent of the preceding fiscal year's paperwork burden.