There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Shipbuilding and Repair Industry Free Trade Act of 1991

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To remedy the serious injury to the United States shipbuilding and repair industry caused by subsidized foreign ships.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/20/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
05/12/1992See H.R.2056.
11/22/1991See H.R.2056.
06/26/1991Referred to the Subcommittee On Merchant Marine.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
06/26/1991Executive Comment Requested from Commerce, DOT.
06/24/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/20/1991Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/20/1991Referred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/20/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (86)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 06/20/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 06/20/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 06/20/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5]* 06/20/1991
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 07/30/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 07/30/1991
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 07/30/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 09/24/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 10/22/1991

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries06/20/1991 Referred to
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Merchant Marine06/26/1991 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/20/1991 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade06/24/1991 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2709. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/20/1991)

Shipbuilding and Repair Industry Free Trade Act of 1991 - Directs the Secretary of Commerce to annually determine and publish the net shipbuilding and repair subsidy provided, directly and indirectly, to each major shipbuilding and repair company in foreign countries meeting certain requirements. Requires the information submitted to the Secretary in connection with the determinations to be treated as proprietary if it meets certain requirements of the Tariff Act of 1930.

Requires each company to repay to its government the total value of the aggregate subsidy provided, plus interest. Directs the Secretary to: (1) require certification from both the company and the foreign government that the payments have occurred; and (2) if requested, verify the repayment.

Directs the Secretary, if a company has not complied, to direct the Commandant of the Coast Guard to collect an annual assessment on each vessel constructed or repaired by the company. Sets the amount of the assessment at the amount of the net subsidy, adjusted by partial repayments and increased by any previous unpaid assessment. Prohibits a vessel from entering a U.S. port until the assessment is paid in full.

Amends the Tariff Act of 1930 to provide for the judicial review of subsidy assessment determinations by the U.S. Court of International Trade.